TN HB0750 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the list of committee chairpersons to whom TACIR will be required to submit a copy of its report concerning state plan to implement state obligations under federal emission guidelines regulating covered electric-generating units, once the guidelines are in effect, to include the chairs of the senate state and local government committee and the local government committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 6; Title 7; Title 49; Title 62; Title 66 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, expands the list of committee chairpersons to whom TACIR will be required to submit a copy of its report concerning state plan to implement state obligations under federal emission guidelines regulating covered electric-generating units, once the guidelines are in effect, to include the chairs of the senate state and local government committee and the local government committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 6; Title 7; Title 49; Title 62; Title 66 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1096 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee