TN HB0750 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the chronic weight management task force to study the health implications of chronic weight management and Type 2 diabetes. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 56, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3; Title 4; Title 56, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 63, relative to the chronic weight management task force.
Sponsors
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] |
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Mark Hall [R] | Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] | Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] |
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 373 | |
2021-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/12/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1277 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021