TN HB0817 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, limits the amount of money that a multicandidate political campaign committee can contribute to candidates and other multicandidate political campaign committees excluding party and caucus PACs; requires multicandidate political campaign committee to certify names and addresses of persons making decisions about the committee's contributions and expenditures. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.
Title
As introduced, limits the amount of money that a multicandidate political campaign committee can contribute to candidates and other multicandidate political campaign committees excluding party and caucus PACs; requires multicandidate political campaign committee to certify names and addresses of persons making decisions about the committee's contributions and expenditures. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-14 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0348 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-09 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0817&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0817.pdf |