TN HB0817 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 322
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 322
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes the provision for the assessor of property recording with the register of deeds an application for the classification of property as agricultural, forest, or open space land discretionary instead of mandatory, and requires the property owner to record the application with the register of deeds if the assessor does not. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, makes the provision for the assessor of property recording with the register of deeds an application for the classification of property as agricultural, forest, or open space land discretionary instead of mandatory, and requires the property owner to record the application with the register of deeds if the assessor does not. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Thomas Tillis [R] |
Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] |
Rep. Gloria Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 322 | |
2019-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/08/2019 | |
2019-05-08 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-24 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0256) |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0211) |
2019-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1184 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 322