TN HB0878 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Effective date(s) 02/21/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Effective date(s) 02/21/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that a person is not required to solemnize a marriage. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 29 and Title 36.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 29 and Title 36, relative to solemnization of marriage.
Sponsors
Rep. Monty Fritts [R] | Rep. Kip Capley [R] | Rep. Gino Bulso [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Bryan Richey [R] |
Rep. Ed Butler [R] | Rep. Jake McCalmon [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. William Slater [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Jody Barrett [R] |
Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Effective date(s) 02/21/2024 | |
2024-03-15 | Pub. Ch. 511 | |
2024-02-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-02-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-02-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-02-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-02-14 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 5 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-03-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-03-06 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 74, Nays 22, PNV 0 |
2023-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-06 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0065) |
2023-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-02 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/6/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/2/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0596 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 511