TN HB1031 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, imposes a $10.00 admission fee on each customer who enters an adult-oriented establishment that provides live nude entertainment and permits the on-site consumption of alcoholic beverages to be used for providing grants for sexual assault programs and the raising of awareness of sexual violence. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51 and Title 71, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, imposes a $10.00 admission fee on each customer who enters an adult-oriented establishment that provides live nude entertainment and permits the on-site consumption of alcoholic beverages to be used for providing grants for sexual assault programs and the raising of awareness of sexual violence. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51 and Title 71, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-02-27 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2013-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-07 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1323 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1031&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1031.pdf |