TN HB1114 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands eligibility for the Tennessee reconnect grant to include students who completed high school or obtained a GED® or HiSET® diploma during the 2019-2020 or 2020-2021 school year, and who are at least 21 years of age by January 1 of the academic year in which they enroll in an eligible program of study. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 4, relative to the Tennessee reconnect grant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/13/2023 |
2023-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to Lottery Calendar |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/27/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0968 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024