TN HB1163 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-31 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Higher Education of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-31 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Higher Education of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a supplemental bridge scholarship program for the 2009-2010 academic year for Tennessee HOPE scholarship students; funds bridge grant program using unobligated and unexpended funds from the energy efficient schools initiative. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9 and Chapter 1203 of the Public Acts of 2008.
Title
As introduced, creates a supplemental bridge scholarship program for the 2009-2010 academic year for Tennessee HOPE scholarship students; funds bridge grant program using unobligated and unexpended funds from the energy efficient schools initiative. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9 and Chapter 1203 of the Public Acts of 2008.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-31 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Higher Education of ED of Education Committee | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education of ED for 03/31/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Action def. in s/c Higher Education of ED to 3/31/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education of ED for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to s/c Higher Education of ED | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to Education | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1884 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-14 - Failed In S. Ed. Comm. Ayes 4, Nays 5 PNV 0
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1163&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1163.pdf |