TN HB1217 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires local law enforcement agencies to open their shooting ranges to public use when not used by law enforcement personnel and requires public users to sign waiver of liability prior to use. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, requires local law enforcement agencies to open their shooting ranges to public use when not used by law enforcement personnel and requires public users to sign waiver of liability prior to use. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2013-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | P1C. |
2013-02-14 | House | Intro. |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1242 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-21 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1217&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1217.pdf |