TN HB1248 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Effective date(s) 05/21/2024, 10/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Effective date(s) 05/21/2024, 10/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a financial service provider, or an officer or employee of the provider, that has reasonable cause to suspect that an elderly or vulnerable adult is the victim or target of financial exploitation, to convey the suspicion to the TBI's elder financial reporting mechanism; requires the TBI to create an elder financial exploitation reporting mechanism that accepts reports from financial institutions. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 38; Title 39; Title 45; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 38; Title 39; Title 45; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to abuse of elders and vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2024, 10/01/2024 | |
2024-05-28 | Pub. Ch. 972 | |
2024-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-05-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-30 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0255) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA1034) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-04-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1067) |
2024-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0334) |
2024-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-01 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0756 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 972