TN HB1270 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises present law relative to community corrections. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 36.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 36, relative to community corrections.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] |
Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Jody Barrett [R] |
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 483 | |
2023-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/19/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2023-03-15 | House | Sponsor change. |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1274 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 06/30/2023