TN HB1350 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-02 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-02 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the speakers of the senate and house of representatives to appoint the members of the advisory task force to review the composition of judicial districts by January 1, 2025, rather than July 1, 2025. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 16; Title 17 and Title 18.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 16; Title 17 and Title 18, relative to judicial districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-04-02 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0305 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024