TN HB1602 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Second Amendment Civil Rights Act of 2018"; confers private right of action upon a person to challenge a government entity that refuses to make property available to third parties for Second Amendment activities when the property is made available for other activities; prohibits government entity from banning the possession of a handgun by a handgun permit holder on property owned or administered by the entity unless security officers inspect all persons entering the premises. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Second Amendment Civil Rights Act of 2018"; confers private right of action upon a person to challenge a government entity that refuses to make property available to third parties for Second Amendment activities when the property is made available for other activities; prohibits government entity from banning the possession of a handgun by a handgun permit holder on property owned or administered by the entity unless security officers inspect all persons entering the premises. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Next Calendar |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-06 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-17 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1955 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-03 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee / no second