TN HB1626 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Fundamental Right to Reproductive Health Care Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 20; Title 37; Title 39; Title 49; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 20; Title 37; Title 39; Title 49; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to reproductive health care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-05 | House | Failed in s/c Population Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Population Health Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Population Health Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-12-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1590 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee