TN HB1651 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date(s) 03/21/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date(s) 03/21/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes a five-day period after the effective date of this act during which a nonprofit organization may apply to operate a charitable gaming event during the annual period beginning July 1, 2023, until June 30, 2024, and beginning July 1, 2024, and ending June 30, 2025. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 17.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3, Chapter 17, relative to charitable gaming.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Effective date(s) 03/21/2024 | |
2024-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 587 | |
2024-03-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-03-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-15 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0624) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-27 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-02-26 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 2, PNV 2 |
2024-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-26 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0551) |
2024-02-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/26/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/14/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-24 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 1/31/2024 |
2024-01-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 1/24/2024 |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1669 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 587