TN HB1655 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides that a person, who is seventy years of age or older, will be excused from jury duty upon asking the court to be excused; authorizes the court to require sufficient proof of age prior to excusing such person. - Amends TCA Title 22.
Title
As introduced, provides that a person, who is seventy years of age or older, will be excused from jury duty upon asking the court to be excused; authorizes the court to require sufficient proof of age prior to excusing such person. - Amends TCA Title 22.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2014-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-16 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1812 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-04 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. comm
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1655&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1655.pdf |