TN HB1699 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-31 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-31 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires local boards of education to include school safety training in the training requirements for substitute teachers. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to school safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | Withdrawn. |
2024-01-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 1/30/2024 |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1665 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee