TN HB1701 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-25 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-25 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires TACIR to complete a study and issue a report on laws, regulations, and rules affecting the start up, operation, and expansion of child care businesses in this state. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 36; Title 37; Title 49 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 36; Title 37; Title 49 and Title 71, relative to child care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | Withdrawn. |
2024-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 1/30/2024 |
2024-01-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |