TN HB1721 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes local governing bodies, by a two-thirds vote, to prorate the 2021 tax assessment for a homeowner's real property or business owner's personal property, if the property was damaged as a result of a FEMA certified disaster between August 20, 2021, and December 31, 2021; expires on December 31, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 5 and Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to tax relief for victims of certain natural disasters.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-02-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/15/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/8/2022 |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2022-01-19 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2821 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/27/2022