TN HB1878 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, entitles certain public employees who are employed in a position requiring mandatory age-based retirement to establish retirement credit for honorable military service during certain periods of armed conflict. - Amends TCA Section 8-34-605 and Section 8-36-205.
Title
As introduced, entitles certain public employees who are employed in a position requiring mandatory age-based retirement to establish retirement credit for honorable military service during certain periods of armed conflict. - Amends TCA Section 8-34-605 and Section 8-36-205.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1864 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee