TN HB1901 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, defines "central bank digital currency," and revises the definitions of "money" and "deposit account," for purposes of the Uniform Commercial Code. - Amends TCA Title 47.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 47, relative to digital currency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Burkhart [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] |
Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 694 | |
2024-04-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-01 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2219 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 04/11/2024