TN HB1912 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a Tennessee HOPE scholarship student or a nontraditional Tennessee HOPE scholarship student who earned the student's first baccalaureate degree between July 1, 2022, and July 1, 2023, in less than five years from the date of the student's initial enrollment at any postsecondary institution to continue to receive the scholarship upon resuming the student's education at an eligible postsecondary institution in pursuit of an advanced degree if the student continues to meet all other applicable eligibility requirements. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to the Tennessee HOPE scholarship.
Sponsors
Rep. Gino Bulso [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/18/2024 |
2024-02-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to Lottery Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/26/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2670 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024