TN HB1955 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases franchise and excise tax credit for financial institutions donating to the Tennessee rural development opportunity fund from 10 percent of contribution to 12.5 percent of contribution. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 16; Title 30; Title 36; Title 39; Title 40; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 61; Title 62; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, increases franchise and excise tax credit for financial institutions donating to the Tennessee rural development opportunity fund from 10 percent of contribution to 12.5 percent of contribution. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 16; Title 30; Title 36; Title 39; Title 40; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 61; Title 62; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-02 | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | |
2009-02-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1878 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-11 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1955&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1955.pdf |