TN HB1990 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 555
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 555
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, replaces references in the Disabled Drivers Law of 1975 to persons "who are permanently and totally confined to a wheelchair" with references to persons "who use a wheelchair because of a permanent incapacity for ambulation". - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 21, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 21, Part 1, relative to the Disabled Drivers Law of 1975.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Hale [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Gino Bulso [R] |
Rep. Ronnie Glynn [D] | Rep. Johnny Garrett [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 555 | |
2024-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-02-15 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/15/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/7/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1976 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 03/11/2024