TN HB1999 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds the MidSouth development district to the list of development districts to which this state intends to assist financially; specifies an overall state funding level for the nine development districts; changes the calculation for how much funding each development district will receive. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 14, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 13, Chapter 14, Part 1, relative to development districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hicks [R] | Rep. Elaine Davis [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] |
Rep. Michael Hale [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] |
Rep. Tim Hicks [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Brock Martin [R] |
Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] | Rep. Michele Carringer [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] |
Rep. Kip Capley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-27 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 2/21/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee to 2/21/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 2/14/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2341 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024