TN HB2210 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "End Hedge Fund Control of Tennessee Homes Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 13; Title 47; Title 48; Title 62; Title 66 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 13; Title 47; Title 48; Title 62; Title 66 and Title 67, relative to single-family residential homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee- Government Operations for Review |
2024-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2490 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee