TN HB2288 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the levy of privilege taxes on wine sold for consumption on the premises at any winery, farm wine producer, or satellite facility. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-207.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the levy of privilege taxes on wine sold for consumption on the premises at any winery, farm wine producer, or satellite facility. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-207.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2045 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee