TN HB2319 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates tax exemption for portions of property that provide tree canopy cover in counties whose local governing bodies elect to create the exemption. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6 and Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6 and Title 67, Chapter 5, relative to tree canopies.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/14/2024 |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2208 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee