TN HB2358 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 935
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 935
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the board of pharmacy to register any mechanical or electronic systems that operate solely on the premises of a hematology or oncology clinic in this state and that perform the storage, control, and dispensing of commercially available drug products pursuant to a valid patient-specific prescription, as part of the operations of a licensed pharmacy; makes related changes. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to dispensing prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Rep. Michele Carringer [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 935 | |
2024-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-25 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2024-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee- Government Operations for Review |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2139 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-13 - Effective date(s) 05/06/2024