TN HB2421 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-26 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-26 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reinstitutes the requirement that the purchaser of a firearm give a thumbprint as part of background check process and that the TBI furnish thumbprint cards and pads to firearm dealers. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, reinstitutes the requirement that the purchaser of a firearm give a thumbprint as part of background check process and that the TBI furnish thumbprint cards and pads to firearm dealers. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-26 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2010-01-25 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-11-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3376 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-13 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2421&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2421.pdf |