TN HB2421 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Failed in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Failed in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows annual course given by ethics commission for supervisory executive branch personnel to be offered electronically and to include information on lobbying. - Amends TCA Title 3 and Title 4.
Title
As introduced, allows annual course given by ethics commission for supervisory executive branch personnel to be offered electronically and to include information on lobbying. - Amends TCA Title 3 and Title 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Failed in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | Ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2450 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee