TN HB2423 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 980
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 980
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes the title of advanced practice nurses to advanced practice registered nurses. - Amends TCA Section 24-9-101; Section 49-2-124; Section 53-10-104; Section 53-10-302; Section 53-11-309; Section 56-32-137; Section 56-7-2408; Section 63-1-109; Section 63-1-301; Section 63-1-313; Section 63-10-204; Section 63-10-217; Section 63-10-505; Section 63-10-506; Title 63, Chapter 29; Section 63-51-102; Section 63-6-244; Section 63-6-802; Title 63, Chapter 7; Section 63-9-121; Section 68-1-128; Section 68-11-224; Section 68-2-601 and Section 71-5-1414.
Title
As enacted, changes the title of advanced practice nurses to advanced practice registered nurses. - Amends TCA Section 24-9-101; Section 49-2-124; Section 53-10-104; Section 53-10-302; Section 53-11-309; Section 56-32-137; Section 56-7-2408; Section 63-1-109; Section 63-1-301; Section 63-1-313; Section 63-10-204; Section 63-10-217; Section 63-10-505; Section 63-10-506; Title 63, Chapter 29; Section 63-51-102; Section 63-6-244; Section 63-6-802; Title 63, Chapter 7; Section 63-9-121; Section 68-1-128; Section 68-11-224; Section 68-2-601 and Section 71-5-1414.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 980 | |
2016-04-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/12/2016 |
2016-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2016-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/9/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee--Business & Utilities--Government Operations for review |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2123 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 980
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2423&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB2423.pdf |