TN HB2491 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands, beyond just student performance in English language arts (ELA) on the most recent Tennessee comprehensive assessment program (TCAP) test, the measures of student growth in ELA that an LEA or public charter school may use in determining whether certain fourth-grade students show adequate growth in ELA; requires LEAs and public charter schools to convene a parent-teacher conference for purposes of determining whether a student who does not show adequate growth in ELA must receive or participate in certain interventions or be retained in fourth grade. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to student performance.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Hurt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2291 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee