TN HB2557 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-11 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-11 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reallocates all funds derived from sale of Eagle Foundation plates, instead of 50 percent of funds provided for in present law, to the Eagle Foundation. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, reallocates all funds derived from sale of Eagle Foundation plates, instead of 50 percent of funds provided for in present law, to the Eagle Foundation. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | Withdrawn. | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on s/c cal Public Safety of TR for 02/16/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | Assigned to s/c Public Safety of TR | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-13 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2557&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2557.pdf |