TN HB2635 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 889
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 889
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, exempts from taxation of real property buildings on land owned by charitable institutions and developed for construction of residences for low-income households. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, exempts from taxation of real property buildings on land owned by charitable institutions and developed for construction of residences for low-income households. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 889 | |
2010-04-22 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-04-19 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/10 | |
2010-04-19 | Reset on Reg cal. for 4/22/10 | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/21/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/15/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/15/2010 | |
2010-04-09 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Action Def. in s/c Local Government of S&LG to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Action Def. in s/c Local Government of S&LG to 3/24/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3348 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 889
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2635&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2635.pdf |