TN HB2664 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of health to submit an electronic copy of the annual report on immunization rates of children, by county, to the governor and the speakers of the senate and the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 14; Title 37, Chapter 10, Part 4; Title 49 and Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 14; Title 37, Chapter 10, Part 4; Title 49 and Title 63, relative to public health notices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-02-28 | House | Ref. to Health Committee - Education Administration |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2519 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee