TN HB2787 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 946
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 946
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the statewide building construction safety standards to allow a local government to amend the adopted building code for three-family dwellings and four-family dwellings in accordance with the standards; provides that, in amending the rules, the state fire marshal must not mandate automatic fire sprinkler systems for three-family dwellings and four-family dwellings where structures are under 5,000 square feet in area and meet other criteria; authorizes local governments to mandate sprinklers if certain conditions are met. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 120.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, Chapter 120, relative to building codes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 946 | |
2024-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2635 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-13 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024