TN HB2817 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from March 31 to March 1, the date by which each municipal solid waste region must submit the annual progress report to the commissioner of environment and conservation for the immediately preceding calendar year that includes data on collection; recycling; transportation; disposal; public costs; and other information relevant to solid waste planning and management. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 47; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 47; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to waste management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2067 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee