TN HB2818 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to TACIR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to TACIR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates different requirements for subdivisions and development in counties in which county-wide zoning has not been enacted. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 3, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, creates different requirements for subdivisions and development in counties in which county-wide zoning has not been enacted. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 3, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to TACIR | |
2012-03-14 | Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to 3/14/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/14/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to 3/14/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/7/2012 | |
2012-01-25 | Assigned to s/c S&LG Subcommittee | |
2012-01-25 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-01-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-19 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2878 (Crossfiled) 2012-01-26 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2818&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB2818.pdf |