TN HB2899 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to include in its training curriculum for emergency medical services personnel materials concerning child abuse and neglect. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 63 and Title 68, Chapter 140.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 63 and Title 68, Chapter 140, relative to emergency services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-03-06 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2922 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee