TN HB2911 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 715
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 715
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that the court may order reasonable visitation to grandparents when it is in the best interest of the child; requires the reasonable visitation to be, at a minimum, sufficient contact that reasonably permits a strong and meaningful relationship to be established with the child. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36, relative to grandparent visitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 715 | |
2024-04-01 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2840 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 04/11/2024