TN HB3229 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1147
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1147
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing vacation lodging services; requires such services to have a vacation lodging service firm license. - Amends TCA Section 62-13-104.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing vacation lodging services; requires such services to have a vacation lodging service firm license. - Amends TCA Section 62-13-104.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McCord [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1147 | |
2010-06-08 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-06-07 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/08/10 | |
2010-06-07 | Reset on Reg cal. for 6/08/10 | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Reset on Reg cal. for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #3 for 6/03/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-05-04 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 05/04/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 04/28/2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Action def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 4/28/2010 Mtg. canceled | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 04/21/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 4/21/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 4/14/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-02-02 | Assigned to s/c Industrial Impact of COM | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3536 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1147
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3229&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3229.pdf |