TN HB3847 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1111
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1111
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Residence Commission Act of 2010." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 23.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Residence Commission Act of 2010." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 23.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1111 | |
2010-06-08 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-06-07 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/08/10 | |
2010-06-07 | Reset on Reg cal. for 6/08/10 | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Reset on Reg cal. for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #3 for 6/03/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-06-02 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 6/2/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to last calendar | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/14/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-03-16 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 3/9/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 03/02/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG | |
2010-02-24 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Action Def. in Government Operations Committee to 2/24/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 02/24/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Action Def. in Government Operations Committee to 2/24/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 02/17/2010 | |
2010-02-08 | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee for reveiw--State & Local | |
2010-02-04 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-02-02 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3847 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1111
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3847&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3847.pdf |