TN HJR0131 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses and establishes the declared public policy of the State of Tennessee relative to the right of the citizens and those within the boundaries of this State to keep, bear, and wear arms.
Title
A RESOLUTION to address and establish the declared public policy of the State of Tennessee relative to the right of the citizens and those within the boundaries of this State to keep, bear, and wear arms.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Garrett [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] |
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Bryan Richey [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] |
Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Jake McCalmon [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] |
Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Jody Barrett [R] |
Rep. Kip Capley [R] | Rep. William Slater [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
Rep. Brock Martin [R] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] | Rep. Tim Hicks [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] |
Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-12 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 4 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 1/23/2024 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-03-06 | House | Adopted, Ayes 75, Nays 20, PNV 0 |
2023-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-02 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/6/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/2/2023 |
2023-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/22/2023 |
2023-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/14/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |