TN HJR0579 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
African American Heritage Society of Rutherford County
Title
African American Heritage Society of Rutherford County
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] |
Rep. Larry Miller [D] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-05-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-11 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 5/10/2017 |
2017-05-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-05-09 | House | Adopted, Ayes 84, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-05-09 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-09 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. #3 for 5/9/17 |
2017-05-09 | House | Filed for intro. |