TN HJR0824 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Zackery Lystedt Brain Project
Title
Zackery Lystedt Brain Project
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-02-26 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-02-25 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-02-25 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-02-25 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-02-25 | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-23 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (1) cal. for 02/25/2010 | |
2010-02-22 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-02-18 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-02-18 | Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2010-02-11 | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 2/18/10 | |
2010-02-11 | Filed for intro. |