TN HJR1291 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 0976
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 0976
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Lang Wiseman, UT board of trustees
Title
Lang Wiseman, UT board of trustees
Sponsors
Rep. David Hawk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | H. subst. & concurred in SJR 0976 |
2018-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | House | R/S Intro., ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-04-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR1291&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/HJR1291.pdf |