TN SB0112 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes exemption that allows sexual offender to be temporarily on school grounds, during school hours, for the purpose of making a mail, food, or other delivery. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, removes exemption that allows sexual offender to be temporarily on school grounds, during school hours, for the purpose of making a mail, food, or other delivery. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Black [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-18 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 02/25/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/25/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 02/18/2009 | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-30 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0482 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-17 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0112&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0112.pdf |