TN SB0112 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 153
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 153
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the board for licensing healthcare facilities and the departments of mental health and substance abuse services, human services, and intellectual and developmental disabilities to amend licensure rules to be consistent with the federal home-based and community-based settings final rule; prohibits the use of emergency rulemaking to promulgate such rules; requires that licensure survey and enforcement be conducted in a manner consistent with any rule issued under this act. - Amends TCA Section 33-2-404; Section 68-11-202 and Section 71-2-412.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the board for licensing healthcare facilities and the departments of mental health and substance abuse services, human services, and intellectual and developmental disabilities to amend licensure rules to be consistent with the federal home-based and community-based settings final rule; prohibits the use of emergency rulemaking to promulgate such rules; requires that licensure survey and enforcement be conducted in a manner consistent with any rule issued under this act. - Amends TCA Section 33-2-404; Section 68-11-202 and Section 71-2-412.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Pub. Ch. 153 | |
2015-04-27 | Effective date(s) 04/16/2015 | |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-02 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-02 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0116) |
2015-04-02 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-03-30 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0140) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/26/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/11/2015 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/11/2015 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/18/2015 |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments. |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0101 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 153