TN SB0112 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the underground utility damage enforcement board two years to June 30, 2019; adds an attendance requirement for members of the board. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 65, Chapter 31.
Title
As enacted, extends the underground utility damage enforcement board two years to June 30, 2019; adds an attendance requirement for members of the board. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 65, Chapter 31.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Pub. Ch. 117 | |
2017-04-19 | Effective date(s) 04/12/2017 | |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-04-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-03-30 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0012) |
2017-03-30 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-02-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0009) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/13/2017 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/8/2017 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0199 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 117